Horsman, Gregory Blaine (CPSO#: 50796)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017