Horwich, Jay Phillip (CPSO#: 21030)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2002