Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hose, Patricia Mary (CPSO#: 55865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 805
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone: (647) 256-3111
Fax: (416) 644-1892
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Hose and Peter Photopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hose ( CPSO# 55865 )
Dr. P. Photopoulos ( CPSO# 62502 )

Business Address:
Suite 805
1243 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M8X 1Y9
Phone Number: (647) 256-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARY HOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1987