Hosenbocus, Sheik Nazim (CPSO#: 42442)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010