Hoskins, Eric William (CPSO#: 55338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2009 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J7
Phone: (416) 690-7269
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC WILLIAM HOSKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSKINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1986