Hossain, Imtiaz (CPSO#: 68428)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003