Hosseini, Seyed Mohammadreza (CPSO#: 111146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 03 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Hospital
David Braley Cardiac, Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute C4 118
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYED MOHAMMADREZA HOSSEINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HOSSEINI is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. HOSSEINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOSSEINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HOSSEINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HOSSEINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HOSSEINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Nov 2016 to 02 Feb 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 03 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018