Hosseinzadeh, Minoos (CPSO#: 60005)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:Laval University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2015