Hossenbux, Farook (CPSO#: 25257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Churchill Avenue North
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5B8
Phone: (613) 722-2959
Fax: (613) 722-3547
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2000

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Oct 2000 Active View Details [+]
            Effective October 2, 2000, Dr. Farook Hossenbux undertakes that he will not
            perform or interpret echocardiograms.