Hossie, Helen Lynne (CPSO#: 64269)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Hossie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Filebank Records Storage, 488 Carlingview Drive, Etobicoke, ON M9W 6M8
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015