Hostetler, John Creighton (CPSO#: 62170)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Slovak

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Sep 1999