Hota, Kalyanram Siva (CPSO#: 100324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone: (613) 354-1779
Fax: (613) 354-6992
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kalyanram Siva Hota Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hota ( CPSO# 100324)

Business Address:
307 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone Number: (613) 354-1779

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALYANRAM SIVA HOTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014