Hota, Lakshmi Bhramara Valli (CPSO#: 73281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Andhra University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Medical Clinic
307 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone: (613) 354-6409
Fax: (613) 354-3801
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valli Hota Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hota ( CPSO# 73281 )

Business Address:
Richmond Medical Clinic
307 Bridge Street West
Napanee ON  K7R 2G3
Phone Number: (613) 354-6409

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 29 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 29, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lakshmi Bhramara
            Valli Hota, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hota to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. LAKSHMI B. V. HOTA
                                          ("Dr. Hota")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hota, certificate of registration number 73281, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214978 (the "Investigation") into my family
                  practice, including my opioid prescribing.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The University of Toronto's Safe Opioid Prescribing Series,
                              or, if that is unavailable, a course satisfactory to the
                              College in opioid prescribing; 
                  
                        (ii)  a review and written summary of each of the following: 
                  
                              1.    Fourth Canadian Consensus Conference on the Diagnosis
                                    and Treatment of Dementia: Recommendations for family
                                    physicians; 
                  
                              2.    Cognitive Impairment Recognition, Diagnosis and
                                    Management in Primary Care;
                  
                              3.    Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Use of
                                    Opioids for Non-Cancer Pain;
                  
                              4.    College Policy #4-12: Medical Records; 
                  
                              5.    College Policy #1-11: Test Results Management.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake to complete this Professional Education at
                        the first possible opportunity.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Professional Education, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the report may
                        form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hota, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hota, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hota, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hota, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Hota's family
                              medicine practice, including her opioid prescribing. As a
                              result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Hota will engage in professional education in:
                                          o     Opioid prescribing
                                          o     Medical recordkeeping
                                          o     Investigation and management of patients
                                                with dementia
                                          o     Test result management
                  
                              *     Dr. Hota's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months after
                                    completion of the professional education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Hota, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Hota, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Hota, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 29, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lakshmi Bhramara Valli Hota to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective May 29, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Hota's family medicine practice, including her opioid prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Hota will engage in professional education in:
- Opioid prescribing
- Medical recordkeeping
- Investigation and management of patients with dementia
- Test result management

- Dr. Hota's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months after completion of the professional education.