Hotte, Simon Laurier (CPSO#: 77464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
165 St-Raymond
Gatineau QC  J8Y 0A7
Phone: (819) 282-7090
Fax: (819) 770-8686
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO
Department of pediatrics
Division of Infectious diseases
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Aug 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON LAURIER HOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007