Hotz, Aaron Ronald (CPSO#: 67906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-0117
Fax: (416) 787-8094
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Hotz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-5693

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON RONALD HOTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOTZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996