Hougesen, Bent (CPSO#: 28642)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 2006