House, Emily Jane (CPSO#: 103806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Robinson, Emily Jane (used until: 14 Jun 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Emily  Jane  House  shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by  the
                  postgraduate  medical education program in which Dr. House is enrolled at
                  Queen's University.

            (2)   In Dr. House's  practice  in  the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. House shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
                  clinical teaching unit that is  formally  affiliated  with the department
                  where Dr. House is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part  of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  House's practice in the postgraduate medical education  program,
                  Dr. House shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. House  may  practise  emergency  medicine  and  to  the extent of her
                  employment  at  West  Parry Sound Health Centre, while under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. House's practice  specified  in  paragraph  (4), Dr. House may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate of registration expires, and Dr. House  must  thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  House is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. House  no  longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a valid employment authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  House  must immediately cease all practice
                  outside the postgraduate medical education  program  if  any  one  of the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College  of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr.  House's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. House's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   House  to  engage  in  practice  outside   the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  House's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. House  takes  a  leave  of  absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion  to   a   regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  House  may not  resume  any  practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. House  applies  for  a  new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2017.  In accordance with paragraph
                  6(a),  this  certificate of registration expires on June 30,  2018.   All
                  practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.