Houston, David Mark (CPSO#: 66720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East End Family Health Team
4715 Highway 101 East
PO Box 3211
South Porcupine ON  P4N 8R6
Phone: (705) 235-6900
Fax: (705) 235-6901
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Houston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Houston ( CPSO# 66720 )

Business Address:
East End Family Health Team
4715 Highway 101 East
South Porcupine ON  P0N 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 235-6900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MARK HOUSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOUSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1996