Houston, James Morrison (CPSO#: 21095)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999