Houttuin, Erik (CPSO#: 21548)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1995