Howard, Andrew William (CPSO#: 62172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Room S 107
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6430
Fax: (416) 813-6414
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew W. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Howard ( CPSO# 62172 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
S107
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6430

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW WILLIAM HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1991