Howard, Craig Richard (CPSO#: 31744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 608
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-5937
Fax: (905) 848-7513
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-5937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Halton Health Care Services
Oakville Trafalgar Site
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 338-2571 Ext. 4618
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. R. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Howard ( CPSO# 31744 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 330-4599

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 330-4599

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG RICHARD HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1984