Howard, Jocelyn Vanessa (CPSO#: 103153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1145 Carling Avenue
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
SUCD Program 2nd floor
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 6137226521 Ext. 6158
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELYN VANESSA HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2016