Howard, Kathleen Gertrude (CPSO#: 28111)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Muhammad, Kathleen Gertrude (used until: 21 Sep 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Noojmowin Teg Health Centre 48 Hillside Rd, AOK, Postal Bag 2002 Hwy 540 Little Current, ON P0P 1K0
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017