Howard, Paul Leroy (CPSO#: 68752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 725-0885
Fax: (705) 725-9498
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6 McPherson Street
HHHS
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 286-2288
Fax: 705 2864723
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 68752 )

Business Address:
301 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Royal Victoria Hospital
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 725-0885

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
6 McPherson Street
Haliburton ON  K0M 2K0
Phone Number: (705) 286-2288

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LEROY HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1997