Howard, Robert James (CPSO#: 32402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5600
Fax: (416) 864-5669
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for copy of their medical records can call Dr. Howard's office at: Tel: (416) 864-5617
Date Received: 04 Nov 2009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1981