Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Howarth, David John Charles (CPSO#: 56783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Pathology
600 University Avenue
Sixth Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4670
Fax: (416) 586-8628
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN CHARLES HOWARTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988