Howarth, Erik (CPSO#: 71311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1328 Labrie Ave
Ottawa ON  K1B 3M1
Phone: (613) 749-4668
Fax: 8444146686
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIK HOWARTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999