Howarth, Paul Ashworth (CPSO#: 28366)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 24 Garden Avenue Ancaster, ON L9G 2J5
Date Received: 09 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Dec 2015