Howatt, Kerry Dawn (CPSO#: 100236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Worth, Kerry Dawn (used until: 09 May 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept Obstetrics and Gynecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRY DAWN HOWATT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HOWATT is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. HOWATT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOWATT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HOWATT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HOWATT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HOWATT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018