Howatt, Michael Merwin (CPSO#: 58622)

Current Status: Suspended as of 11 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2006

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 11 Apr 2006


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Executive Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2006 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 11 Apr 2006
Summary:

 On April 11, 2006, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Howatt to be incapacitated and 
 ordered the Registrar to suspend Dr. Howatt(s certificate of registration effective 
 immediately.

The Fitness to Practise Committee:

 

a)      finds that Dr. Howatt is 
 incapacitated as defined in the Health Professions Procedural Code;

b)      orders the Registrar 
 to suspend Dr. Howatt(s certificate of registration effective immediately;

c)      orders that 
 Dr. Howatt will not return to any type of practice until specified assessors reassess him and 
 certify to the College, to its satisfaction, that Dr. Howatt is fit to practise.  Dr. Howatt may 
 apply for reassessment upon submission by him of a report from a duly qualified medical doctor or 
 psychologist which sets out in sufficient detail to satisfy the College, acting reasonably, there 
 has been a sufficient change in Dr. Howatt(s medical condition to warrant reassessment.  In 
 certain circumstances, Dr. Howatt may request a hearing before the Fitness to Practise Committee, 
 at which the assessors shall be permitted to testify;

d)      Once Dr. Howatt is again found fit 
 to practice based on the above procedures, the Registrar shall impose on Dr. Howatt(s certificate 
 of registration a term, condition or limitation that he shall not engage in independent practice 
 but that he can practice, for example, in an emergency setting or a hospital acceptable to the 
 College; and,

e)      if at any time Dr. Howatt applies for an educational program or for 
 hospital privileges, the educational program or hospital shall be provided with the order of the 
 Fitness to Practise Committee and all original and subsequent assessors( reports as well as the 
 information that allegations (specifying the nature of the allegations) had been referred to the 
 Discipline Committee of the College and had been dismissed on joint submission of the parties so 
 that the matter would be dealt with by way of incapacity.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 11 Apr 2006


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Oct 2000
Summary:

 On October 27, 2000, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found Dr. Howatt guilty of professional misconduct with regard to charging a fee to patients that 
 is excessive in relation to the services he performed, charging a fee to a patient for services 
 which he did not perform, failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his 
 care and treatment of patients, committing acts relevant to the practice of medicine with patients 
 having regard to all the circumstances which would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unpforessional, and sexually abusing a patient.  The Committee also 
 found Dr. Howatt guilty of incompetence in that he displayed in his professional care of patients, 
 a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard to the welfare of these patients, of a nature 
 or to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue in practice or that his practice 
 should be restricted.  

The Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Howatt be reprimanded, the fact 
 of the reprimand to be recorded on the register, revocation of his certificate of registration 
 effective immediately.  Dr. Howatt is to pay costs to the College in the amount of $10,000.

On 
 December 6, 2002, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Howatt's appeal of the decision of the 
 Discipline Committee. The Divisional Court quashed the decision and directed the case be remitted 
 to the Discipline Committee for a new hearing before a new panel.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 06 Dec 2002
Hearing Date(s): 04 Jul 2000