Howell, Kathleen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 83378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2039 Robertson Road
Suite 402
Nepean ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 422-1452
Fax: 866-462-6424
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Mental Health
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELIZABETH HOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2008 to 25 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010