Howidi, Mohammad Hassan (CPSO#: 56334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 165
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (226) 221-9101
Fax: (226) 221-9102
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Howidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Howidi ( CPSO# 56334 )

Business Address:
Suite 165
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (226) 221-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD HASSAN HOWIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013