Howlett, Andrew Lindsay (CPSO#: 86470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Centre
3rd Floor, Our Lady of Mercy Wing
Room 3L-234
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6825
Fax: (416) 530-6393
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 University Ave
Room 8-924
Toronto AB  M5G 1Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 1559
Fax: 416-586-8596
County: 
Electoral District: 

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW LINDSAY HOWLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012