Howlett, Christopher Jon (CPSO#: 80742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36338
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Howlett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Howlett ( CPSO# 80742 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Department of Anatomical Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JON HOWLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009