Howse, Kelly Lee (CPSO#: 86318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Family Health Team
115 Clarence St
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Phone: (613) 533-9303
Fax: (613) 533-9308
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howse Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Simpson ( CPSO# 86420 )
Dr. K. Howse ( CPSO# 86318 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
275 Sydenham Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1G7
Phone Number: (613) 549-4164

Business Address:
Queen's Family Health Team
115 Clarence Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY LEE HOWSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009