Howson-Jan, Kang (CPSO#: 51384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medicine
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 52169
Fax: (519) 685-8294
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Howson-Jan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Howson-Jan ( CPSO# 51384 )

Business Address:
Department of Medicine
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 3, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kang Howson-Jan, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Howson-Jan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. KANG HOWSON-JAN
                                    ("Dr. Howson-Jan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, certificate of registration number 51384, am a member
                  of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice and that the College is conducting an investigation
                  into that information.

            (3)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (4)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude
                  the ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with
                  the Code.

            (5)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently being investigated are disposed of by a panel
                  of the ICR Committee or the Discipline Committee.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)") ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independent of my participation, on the basis
                              of the areas of concern identified in the medical inspector's
                              report(s), received August 2, 2016, and any concerns that
                              arise during the period of Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the report(s) of the medical inspector
                        received August 2, 2017 and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (9)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                  with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any
                  other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that, in the event of a referral to the
                  Discipline Committee and in the event of an appeal of any Order of the
                  Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (16)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that, in addition to this
                        Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above,
                        the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during
                        the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, except
                        that in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee the
                        first sentence shall be amended to read, "Dr. Howson-Jan is the
                        subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations
                        of" [any allegations will be set out]:
                  
                              Dr. Howson-Jan is the subject of an investigation by the
                              College regarding his standard of practice. As a result of
                              the ongoing investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Howson-Jan must practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, the Drug Program Services Branch, NMS
                  and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information,
                  in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of
                  this Undertaking. 

            (19)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                  consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                  respectively. 

            (20)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Howson-Jan, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical
                  Supervisors and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kang Howson-Jan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 3, 2017:

Dr. Howson-Jan is the subject of an investigation by the College regarding his standard of practice. As a result of the ongoing investigation:

- Dr. Howson-Jan must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.