Hoyle, Bruce Ryerson (CPSO#: 55009)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995