Hradecky, Cyril Michael (CPSO#: 26329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Queensway Carleton
Ottawa ON  K2H 8N7
Phone: (613) 721-4700
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Cyril Michael
            Hradecky, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hradecky
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                  
                  
                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. CYRIL MICHAEL HRADECKY
                                          ("Dr. Hradecky")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hradecky, certificate of registration number 26329, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that I currently practice only at Queensway
                  Carleton Hospital (Ottawa).

            (4)   I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that I do not practice at any practice
                  location, including but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics and
                  offices, in any jurisdiction other than Queensway Carleton Hospital
                  (Ottawa) (my "Practice Location"), nor do I have privileges at any other
                  hospital whatsoever. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Hradecky, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hradecky, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice
                        of medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient(s)
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hradecky, undertake that the entirety of my scope of
                        practice will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon:
                  
                              a.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              b.    who holds privileges at one of my Practice Locations,
                                    or other Practice Location as may be approved by the
                                    College,
                  
                              (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                        (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                              section (6)(b)(i) above:
                  
                              a.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative
                                    care whatsoever; and
                  
                              b.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in
                                    attendance when I am engaging in my practice as a
                                    surgical assistant.
                  
                        (c)   I, Dr. Hradecky, undertake that I will not engage in any
                              practice of medicine that is not expressly and specifically
                              listed in section (6)(b) above.
                  
                        (d)   I, Dr. Hradecky, undertake that I will not commence surgical
                              assisting at any other Practice Location without prior
                              approval of the College. Should I seek privileges to perform
                              surgical assisting at any other Practice Location, I shall
                              advise the College within five (5) days of making such
                              application, and shall seek approval to practice surgical
                              assisting at the Practice Location at least fourteen (14)
                              days before I plan to commence surgical assisting at that
                              location. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Hradecky, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                  representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the
                  provisions of this Undertaking.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a
                  colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Hradecky may only practise as a surgical assistant under
                              the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hradecky
                              shall limit his practice to Queensway Carleton Hospital
                              (Ottawa) unless he obtains the consent of the College to
                              practise elsewhere.
                  
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Hradecky, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Hradecky, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A".

            (17)  I, Dr. Hradecky, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Qualified Surgeon(s) and Chief(s) of Staff with any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Hradecky, give my irrevocable consent to any Qualified Surgeon and
                  any Chief of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, all
                  information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes
                  of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.   

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cyril Michael Hradecky to the College of Physicians and Surgeons effective April 30, 2017:

Dr. Hradecky may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hradecky shall limit his practice to Queensway Carleton Hospital (Ottawa) unless he obtains the consent of the College to practise elsewhere.