Hreno, Andrew (CPSO#: 30347)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 Dec 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005