Hrycyshyn, Betty Ann (CPSO#: 30884)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact: The Oshawa Clinic Archives Department at (905) 723-8551 ext. 3571.
Date Received: 30 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012