Hsia, Ivan Kai-Hsiang (CPSO#: 80881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital - Wilson
Department of Anaesthesiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000 Ext. 48000
Fax: 416-242-1069
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ivan Hsia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hsia ( CPSO# 80881 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital - Wilson
Department of Anaesthesiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVAN KAI-HSIANG HSIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009