Hsieh, Tian Tzer (CPSO#: 54353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Kaohsiung Medical College, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Dundas Street West
Suite 401
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone: (905) 666-1777
Fax: (905) 666-1922
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Tian Tzer Hsieh, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hsieh to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                          DR. TIAN TZER HSIEH
                                             ("Dr. Hsieh")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hsieh, certificate of registration number 54353, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my medical
                  record-keeping arising from a reassessment of my practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that, upon receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College has agreed to take no further
                  action at this time in respect of the reassessment.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review at least ten (10) of my patient charts once every
                              month for a period of six (6) months;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me once every month in person, for a period of six
                              (6) months. At least three of the visits will take place at
                              my practice location.
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews; 
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;

                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision, and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once
                              quarterly, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        assessor received October 9, 2015 and March 4, 2016 and concerns
                        that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College, and ensure that it is delivered to
                        the College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Hsieh, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Hsieh, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the Clinical Supervision set out above; 
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor, and
                  
                        (iii) review and written summary of the following CPSO policies,
                              including a written summary of the documents with a reference
                              of how they are applicable to my practice as well as how I
                              plan to make changes to my practice:
                  
                              Medical Records: 
                              
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records 
                  
                              Test Results:
                              
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Test-Results-Management
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake that approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached,
                        I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment")
                        by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Assessor(s)"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hsieh, understand that the Reassessment will focus on charts
                        from the six (6) month period immediately following the Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hsieh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), and/or any person or institution that may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Hsieh, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (14)  I, Dr. Hsieh, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Hsieh was the subject of an assessment of his record-keeping
                        arising from an investigation of his practice. As a result of the
                        assessment:
                  
                        *     Dr. Hsieh will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Hsieh's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Hsieh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Hsieh, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Hsieh, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking, and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hsieh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 18, 2016:

Dr. Hsieh was the subject of an assessment of his record-keeping arising from an investigation of his practice. As a result of the assessment:

• Dr. Hsieh will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

• Dr. Hsieh’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.