Hsieh, Wayne Wen-Yuan (CPSO#: 68751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lapsley Family Doctors
13 Lapsley Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 1K1
Phone: (416) 754-9595
Fax: (416) 754-3946
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wayne Hsieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hsieh ( CPSO# 68751 )

Business Address:
Lapsley Family Doctors
13 Lapsley Road
Toronto ON  M1B 1K1
Phone Number: (416) 754-9593

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE WEN-YUAN HSIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIEH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1997