Hsiung, Ging-Yuek Robin (CPSO#: 65377)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007