Hsu, Patrick Sung Lung (CPSO#: 30219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctors Plaza
Alcorn Drive
Suite 110
Corinth MS  38834
United States
Phone: (601) 286-0930
Fax: (662) 287-5792

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Mississippi

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK SUNG LUNG HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1988