Hsu, Tina Yun-Chin (CPSO#: 84998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tina Hsu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hsu ( CPSO# 84998 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA YUN-CHIN HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011