Hsu, Yin Sho (CPSO#: 61229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#106, 3530 Derry Rd. E.
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Phone: 905-671-1052
Fax: 905-671-8489
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32 SOUTH UNIONVILLE AVE. UNIT 1010
Markham ON  L3R 9S6
Canada
Phone: 416-291-0033
Fax: 905-513-9538
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Taiwan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIN SHO HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1990