Hsuen, John Shan Chung (CPSO#: 27746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education:University of Madras, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
67 Churchill Avenue
North York ON  M2N 1Y8
Phone: (416) 222-7358
Fax: (416) 221-5624
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hsuen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hsuen ( CPSO# 27746 )

Business Address:
67 Churchill Avenue
Toronto ON  M2N 1Y8
Phone Number: (416) 222-7358

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN SHAN CHUNG HSUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSUEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1985