Hu, Charles Chen (CPSO#: 106423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GrandView Lodge
657 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V9
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Hu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hu ( CPSO# 106423)

Business Address:
Grandview Lodge
657 Lock Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1V9
Phone Number: (905) 774-7547

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES CHEN HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017